Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 19:45:58 (UTC).

Steven Sanghera vs. Muddy Waters Kava Inc

Case Summary

On 06/20/2014 Steven Sanghera filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Muddy Waters Kava Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5331

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanghera, Steven

Defendant

Muddy Waters Kava Inc

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Dismissed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/23/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less