Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 03:22:15 (UTC).

Steven Sanghera vs. David J Boyet

Case Summary

On 08/26/2014 Steven Sanghera filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against David J Boyet. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8597

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanghera, Steven

Defendants

Boyet, Bonnie R.

Boyet, David J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David E Scribner

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/16/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/16/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Boyet, Bonnie(Defendant); Boyet, David(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/16/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Boyet, Bonnie(Defendant); Boyet, David(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/16/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/08/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sanghera, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less