This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/06/2017 at 03:00:23 (UTC).

Stephen Phelps vs. US Home Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/23/2011 Stephen Phelps filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against US Home Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1306

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hanefield, Harold

Perron, Marla

Phelps, Stephen

Kincade, Donald

Ellis, John

Reysner, Piotr

Defendant

US Home Corporation

Cross Defendants

I M Consntruction Inc

Sacramento A-1 Door

California Mantel Inc

Hard Hat

Energetic Lath & Plaster Inc

Center Fireplace & Appliance

Martinez Painting & Drywall

Energetic Painting & Drywall Inc

Joe Catello Tile

Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation

Sierra Grading

Intervenors

Northern Insurance Company of New York

American Zurich Insurance Company on behalf of Energetic Lath & Plaster Inc

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald B Malanga

Defendant Attorney

William J Peters

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Paul R Cotter

Matthew R Day

Chad S Tapp

Julie McElroy

Roberta E Nalbandian

Alan Foutz

John E Riddle

Other Attorneys

Edwin S Nakagawa

Monica M Espejo

Patrick Au

John Van De Poel, Jr

Deborah A Correll

Ted D Wood

Kirstin Wallace

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/19/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/19/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/18/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/18/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/21/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/21/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/15/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/15/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 04/08/2016 03:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 04/08/2016 03:30:00 PM published .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Everest Concrete Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/26/2012 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/26/2012 02:00:00 PM .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Insulation Contractors(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/09/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/09/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Ike's Landscape Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Appearance) filed.

Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Appearance) filed. (Filed By: I M Consntruction Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Appearance filed.

Notice of Appearance filed. (Filed By: Creative Window Concepts Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Creative Window Concepts Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 10/14/2015 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 10/14/2015 02:00:00 PM .

281 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:00 PM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
410 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/19/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (Amended - Issued) filed. (Filed By: Ear, Michael(Plaintiff); Ellis, John(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Harold(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Sue(Plaintiff); Kincade, Donald(Plaintiff); Kincade, Gloria(Plaintiff); Perron, Marla(Plaintiff); Perron, Ronald(Plaintiff); Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff); Sherman, Craig(Plaintiff); Wright, Brian(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bergeron, Peter(Plaintiff); Ear, Michael(Plaintiff); Ellis, John(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Harold(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Sue(Plaintiff); Kincade, Donald(Plaintiff); Kincade, Gloria(Plaintiff); Perron, Marla(Plaintiff); Perron, Ronald(Plaintiff); Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff); Reysner, Piotr(Plaintiff); Sherman, Craig(Plaintiff); Wright, Brian(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/23/2011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ear, Michael(Plaintiff); Ellis, John(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Harold(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Sue(Plaintiff); Perron, Marla(Plaintiff); Perron, Ronald(Plaintiff); Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Ear, Michael(Plaintiff); Ellis, John(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Harold(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Sue(Plaintiff); Perron, Marla(Plaintiff); Perron, Ronald(Plaintiff); Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ear, Michael(Plaintiff); Ellis, John(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Harold(Plaintiff); Hanefield, Sue(Plaintiff); Perron, Marla(Plaintiff); Perron, Ronald(Plaintiff); Phelps, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Martinez Painting & Drywall is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mantel Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Energetic Lath & Plaster Inc is a litigant