This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:50:30 (UTC).

Stephen Chipp vs. Digital Safety Technologies Inc

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 Stephen Chipp filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Digital Safety Technologies Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6978

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chipp, Jeannine

Chipp, Stephen

Claimant

California Public Employees' Retirement System

Defendants

Dell Marketing LP

Digital Safety Technologies Inc

Does 1-100

Integrian Inc

Lehr auto Electric Inc

Utility Associates Inc

CCV Inc

Custom Command Vehicles Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eustice De Saint Phalle

Claimant Attorney

Charles Glauberman

Defendant Attorneys

Sandra A Edwards

Craig D Trippel

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 03/15/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 03/15/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 02/06/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 02/06/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Default denied as to Digital Safety Technologies Inc; Integrian Inc on Complaint .

Default denied as to Digital Safety Technologies Inc; Integrian Inc on Complaint .

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Utility Associates Inc(Defendant))

Notice of Motion (for Order Granting App to Appear Pro Hac Vice) filed.

Notice of Motion (for Order Granting App to Appear Pro Hac Vice) filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed.

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of MSJ) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed.

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Utility Associates Inc(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Utility Associates Inc(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit List (Compendium of Evidence) filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (iso MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Dell Marketing LP(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Utility Associates Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Trippel, Craig D added as a effective 03/02/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/20/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Chipp, Jeannine(Plaintiff); Chipp, Stephen(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less