This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 15:38:17 (UTC).

Stefanie Kudar vs. Dyncorp International , a Delaware Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 Stefanie Kudar filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dyncorp International , a Delaware Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6032

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kudar, Stefanie

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FORESTRY AND FIRE PROTECTION

Does 1-20

Dyncorp International , a Delaware Corporation

Dyncorp International LLC , a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas F. Walters, Esq

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Sible

Robert J. Schnack

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Dyncorp International LLC , a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Forestry And Fire Protection(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Dyncorp International LLC , a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: California Department of Forestry And Fire Protection(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dyncorp International LLC , a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Forestry And Fire Protection(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Dyncorp International LLC , a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Schnack, Robert J. added as a effective 04/28/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/05/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kudar, Stefanie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less