This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 03:52:48 (UTC).

SOBE EQUITY. INC. VS. DEBRA JEAN TRIPLETT

Case Summary

On 07/27/2006 SOBE EQUITY INC filed an Other lawsuit against DEBRA JEAN TRIPLETT. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3185

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Sobe Equity Inc

Defendant

Triplett, Debra Jean

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sierra Investment

Ryco Real Estate

Ryco Property Management

York and Associates

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems

York, James

York and Associates Real Estate

Dennis, Edward R.

Ryco Mortgage

Roes 1-50

JM Properties

Sobe Equity Inc

Maihack, Jeffery S.

J and M Home Loans

J & M Homs Loans

American River Home Loans

Tillet, Mark J.

Lecroy, Michelle K.

Biegler, Roland D.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Klaus J. Kolb

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R Eason

Eason and Tambornini

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (Responses to Interrog; Estab Admissions) filed.

Motion to Compel Discovery (Responses to Interrog; Estab Admissions) filed. (Filed By: Dennis, Edward(Cross - Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Dennis, Edward(Cross - Defendant))

Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, Feb. 25, 2008, Dropped) filed.

Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, Feb. 25, 2008, Dropped) filed. (Filed By: Dennis, Edward(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Triplett, Debra(Cross - Complainant))

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed. (Filed By: American River Home Loans(Cross - Defendant); Biegler, Roland(Cross - Defendant); JM Properties(Cross - Defendant); Sobe Equity Inc(Cross - Defendant); Tillet, Mark(Cross - Defendant); York, James(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Triplett, Debra(Cross - Complainant))

Trial Brief filed.

Trial Brief filed. (Filed By: Klaus, KolbKlaus J. Kolb(Attorney))

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed. (Filed By: Klaus, KolbKlaus J. Kolb(Attorney))

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/06/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/06/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Dismissal not entered as requested

Dismissal not entered as requested

Stipulation and Order Re Filing Date for Reply Closing Briefs - Granted

Stipulation and Order Re Filing Date for Reply Closing Briefs - Granted

Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed.

Motion to Strike or Tax Costs filed. (Filed By: Triplett, Debra(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (of James P. York III in Support of Motion for New Trial) filed.

Declaration - Other (of James P. York III in Support of Motion for New Trial) filed. (Filed By: Sobe Equity Inc(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Triplett, Debra(Cross - Complainant))

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Dennis, Edward(Cross - Complainant))

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Dennis, Edward(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/27/2009 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/27/2009 02:00:00 PM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Sobe Equity Inc(Plaintiff))

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion for New Trial - Post Trial Motions; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 39; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 39; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2007
  • Ryco Mortgage added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Maihack, Jeffery S. added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Lecroy, Michelle K. added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Klaus, Kolb J. added as a Attorney effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Eason & Tambornini added as a Attorney effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • EASON, MATTHEW R. added as a Attorney effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Dennis, Edward R added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Capital Trust Investment, Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Biegler, Roland D added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • American River Home Loan added as a Cross - Defendant effective 07/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less