This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 16:31:50 (UTC).

Scott Johnson vs. Windmill Place Apartments LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2015 Scott Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Windmill Place Apartments LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6215

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Scott

Defendants

Does 1-10

Windmill Place Apartments LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond G Ballister

Defendant Attorney

Michael D Welch

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Answer (Windmill Place Apartments LLC's Answer to Complaint) filed.

Answer (Windmill Place Apartments LLC's Answer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

Request - Other (Request for nAdmissions, Propounded by Plaintiff) filed.

Request - Other (Request for nAdmissions, Propounded by Plaintiff) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Response (to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed.

Response (to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

Response (to Mot/Compel Discovery) filed.

Response (to Mot/Compel Discovery) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Interrogatories) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Interrogatories) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to the Demand to Produce Documents) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to the Demand to Produce Documents) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order (Granting plfs Motion to Compel Responses from defs) filed.

Proposed Order (Granting plfs Motion to Compel Responses from defs) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Paper Exhibits (in support of plfs Motion to Compel Discovery) filed.

Paper Exhibits (in support of plfs Motion to Compel Discovery) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Response (to Motion to Compel and Deem Admitted) filed.

Response (to Motion to Compel and Deem Admitted) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Motion for Terminating Sanctions (memo of points and authorities;declaration of Sara Gunderson;proposed order) filed.

Motion for Terminating Sanctions (memo of points and authorities;declaration of Sara Gunderson;proposed order) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Sara Gunderson) filed.

Declaration - Other (Sara Gunderson) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/01/2017 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/01/2017 02:00:00 PM .

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Deem Matters Admitted - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/01/2017 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/01/2017 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Sara Gunderson) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Terminating Sanctions (memo of points and authorities;declaration of Sara Gunderson;proposed order) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Deem Matters Admitted - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/11/2016 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (to Mot/Compel Discovery) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for nAdmissions, Propounded by Plaintiff) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Welch, Michael D added as a effective 08/12/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Windmill Place Apartments LLC's Answer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Windmill Place Apartments LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/10/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less