This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 17:44:46 (UTC).

Scott Johnson vs. Kopple Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2015 Scott Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kopple Financial, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6536

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Scott

Defendants

230 Cadillac Drive, A KF LP

Does 1-10

Kopple Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond G Ballister

Defendant Attorney

George A Guthrie

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: 230 Cadillac Drive, A KF LP(Defendant); Kopple Financial, Inc.(Defendant))

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Johnson, Scott rejected on 01/04/2016 .

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Johnson, Scott rejected on 01/04/2016 . (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed.

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Motion for Attorney Fees filed.

Motion for Attorney Fees filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Mark Potter in Support of Pltfs Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Mark Potter in Support of Pltfs Motion) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Motion for Attny Fees) filed.

Opposition (to Motion for Attny Fees) filed. (Filed By: 230 Cadillac Drive, A KF LP(Defendant); Kopple Financial, Inc.(Defendant))

Reply (Brief in Support of its Mot/Atty Fees) filed.

Reply (Brief in Support of its Mot/Atty Fees) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply (Brief in Support of its Mot/Atty Fees) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition (to Motion for Attny Fees) filed. (Filed By: 230 Cadillac Drive, A KF LP(Defendant); Kopple Financial, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 07/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Mark Potter in Support of Pltfs Motion) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorney Fees filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Johnson, Scott rejected on 01/04/2016 . (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: 230 Cadillac Drive, A KF LP(Defendant); Kopple Financial, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/17/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Scott(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less