This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 08:09:28 (UTC).

Sara Hale Goulas vs. Estate of Stanley B Ryan

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 Sara Hale Goulas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Estate of Stanley B Ryan. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4730

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Goulas, Michael

Hale Goulas, Sara

Defendants

Does I-Doe XX

Estate of Stanley B Ryan

Family Auto Centers

Gheyri, Sean

Zamir, Masin

Gheyri, Sassan

Cross Defendants

Roes 1-10

Hale, Joan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J Owen

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey M. Schaff

P Christian Scheley

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Complainant); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Complainant); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Complainant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Defendant))

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Cross - Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Defendant); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Defendant); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Cross - Complainant))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Zamir, Masin(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Complainant); Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Gheyri, Sassan(Cross - Complainant); Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff); Zamir, Masin(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Stanley B Ryan(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2015
  • Scheley, P Christian added as a effective 12/16/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/25/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Goulas, Michael(Plaintiff); Hale Goulas, Sara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less