This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 20:22:56 (UTC).

Sacramento Municipal Utility District vs. Brock Everett Ashford

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 Sacramento Municipal Utility District filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brock Everett Ashford. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5506

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sacramento Municipal Utility District

Defendants

Ashford, Brock Everett

Dose 1 through 20

Worthington, John D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A Weyuker

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/07/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/07/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/07/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/07/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/27/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Municipal Utility District(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sacramento Municipal Utility District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weyuker, Richard A.