Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/05/2017 at 11:48:03 (UTC).

SACRAMENTO CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST VS FRED B CURTIS. ETAL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2002 SACRAMENTO CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DIST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRED B CURTIS ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6061

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sacramento City Unified School District

Defendants

Fields Consolidated Fiber Glass Co

Pully & Associates

Conglas

Fred B Curtis Inc

Consolidated Fiberglass Products Company

Amwest Insurance Group Inc

Fields Corporation

Cox & Associates

Cox, Robert G.

McClean & Tillotson Inc

Durrant Group Inc

Matriscope Inc

Curtis, Fred B.

Curtis Roofing

Cross Defendant

McLean & Tillotson

Arbitrator

Ramsey, Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas W Barth

Paul W Tozer

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Glaspy

Stephan L Parshall

Rocky K Copley

Drew M Johnson

Jacob Koper

Tom H Bailey

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Anne E Connelly

Lindy H Scoffield

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: McLean & Tillotson(Cross - Defendant))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Change of Address and Telephone filed.

Notice of Change of Address and Telephone filed. (Filed By: Fields Corporation(Defendant))

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

Motion - Other (To Advance Trial Setting) filed.

Motion - Other (To Advance Trial Setting) filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

Order Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings

Order Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 06/04/2008 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 06/04/2008 09:30:00 AM .

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (CCP 2034.260) filed.

Declaration - Other (CCP 2034.260) filed. (Filed By: Curtis, Fred(Defendant))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Fields Consolidated Fiber Glass Co(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application - Other filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Order Thereon

Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Order Thereon

Order Determining Dispostition of Ex parte Application

Order Determining Dispostition of Ex parte Application

Notice - Other (Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial Date) filed.

Notice - Other (Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial Date) filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 12/16/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 12/16/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Correspondence (faxed letter of settlement) filed.

Correspondence (faxed letter of settlement) filed. (Filed By: Tozer, Paul(Attorney))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Sacramento City Unified School District(Plaintiff))

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2007
  • Connelly, Anne E added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Bailey, Tom H added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Parshall, Stephan L added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Koper, Jacob added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Johnson, Drew M added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Glaspy, David M added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • Copley, Rocky K added as a effective 10/03/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: McLean & Tillotson(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2007
  • Scoffield, Lindy H added as a effective 12/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2007
  • McLean & Tillotson added as a Cross - Defendant effective 12/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sacramento City Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul W Tozer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barth, Thomas W.