This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 18:57:40 (UTC).

Rosa Aguilar vs. 99 Cents Only Stores

Case Summary

On 05/22/2012 Rosa Aguilar filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against 99 Cents Only Stores. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5004

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguilar, Rosa

Defendants

99 Cents Only Stores

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Rancano

Defendant Attorney

Jenny H Hong

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: 99 Cents Only Stores(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: 99 Cents Only Stores(Defendant))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2012 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2012 08:30:00 AM .

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Compelling Arbitration) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Compelling Arbitration) filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Compelling Arbitration) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Stipulation and Order - Other (Compelling Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2012 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: 99 Cents Only Stores(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Hong, Jenny H added as a effective 09/04/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/25/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Aguilar, Rosa(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less