Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 06:16:19 (UTC).

Ronald King vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 09/09/2014 Ronald King filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8742

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Ronald

Defendants

Does 1-100

State of California

State Water Resources Control Board

California State Water Resources Control Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcus A Mancini

Defendant Attorneys

David J Neill

Loren E Dieu

Kamala Devi Harris

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Reply (to Amendment to Complaint, Request for Dismissal and First Amended Complaint) filed.

Reply (to Amendment to Complaint, Request for Dismissal and First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Reply to Amendment to Complaint, Request for Dismissal and First Amended Complaint) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Reply to Amendment to Complaint, Request for Dismissal and First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/04/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/04/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Demurrer (to 1st Amended Complaint) filed.

Demurrer (to 1st Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed.

Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant))

Amended Complaint (THIRD) filed.

Amended Complaint (THIRD) filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/30/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/30/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State of California(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Neill, David J added as a effective 10/21/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Summons issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/30/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: King, Ronald(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS KAMALA D. ESQ.