Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/04/2017 at 22:03:06 (UTC).

ROGER WANG. PATRICIA WANG VS. JTS COMMUNITIES. INC.. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/22/2007 ROGER WANG PATRICIA WANG filed an Other lawsuit against JTS COMMUNITIES INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2332

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liu, Jonathon H.

Wang, Roger

Defendants

J&L Properties

Does 1-500

Cross Defendants

Simas Floor Company Inc

Tile-Tech Roofing Co

M Crowe Construction

Beutler Corporation

Freelance Lath

Cal Sierra Fence

Fischer Tile and Marble Inc

Sacramento A-1 Door Inc

Maher Construction Inc

Susich Jr, Frank

Conable Trim Inc

H&D Electric Inc

Milgard Manufacturing Inc

Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc

Northstar Plumbing and Construction Inc

Not Classified By Court and Special Master

Goldstein, Leigh A.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luke P Ryan

Defendant Attorney

Dan S. Demund

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Mah

David E Beeby

Amanda R Lowe

Todd A Jones

Bruce A Trevithick

Karen L Jacobsen

Keith R Pawloski

Other Attorneys

Michael J. Levangie

Jerry M Duncan

Michael J Estep

Jennifer H Carroll

Stephen D Flaherty

Scott D Cote

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/21/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/21/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/24/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/24/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/19/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/19/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/20/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/20/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 11/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/15/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/15/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: J&L Properties(Cross - Complainant); JTS Communities Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Notice of Appearance filed.

Notice of Appearance filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Tyler, John(Plaintiff); Tyler, Maria(Plaintiff); Wang, Patricia(Plaintiff); Wang, Roger(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wang, Roger(Plaintiff))

Recommendation and Order RE Defendant JTS Communities, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Gregory and Arlene Jung for Failure to make their property available for inspection as required by Pre-Trial Order No.1

Recommendation and Order RE Defendant JTS Communities, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Gregory and Arlene Jung for Failure to make their property available for inspection as required by Pre-Trial Order No.1

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Fischer Tile and Marble Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Wang, Patricia(Plaintiff); Wang, Roger(Plaintiff))

Order Granting Cross Defendant Northstar Plumbing & Construction, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order Granting Cross Defendant Northstar Plumbing & Construction, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: JTS Communities Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 04/15/2010 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
254 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Wang, Patricia(Plaintiff); Wang, Roger(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Wang, Roger added as a Plaintiff effective 05/22/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Wang, Patricia added as a Plaintiff effective 05/22/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • JTS Communities Inc added as a Defendant effective 05/22/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • J&L Properties added as a Defendant effective 05/22/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Designated a complex action on 12/06/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Designated as an exceptional action on 12/06/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Wang, Roger(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Wang, Roger added as a Plaintiff effective 05/22/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Case assigned to Department 24 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J&L Properties is a litigant

Latest cases where M Crowe Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where Northstar Plumbing is a litigant

Latest cases where H&D Electric INC is a litigant