This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 06:34:17 (UTC).

Rodney Lazard vs. Samuel Daniel Valdez

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 Rodney Lazard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samuel Daniel Valdez. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4436

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lazard, Rodney

Defendants

Ballard, Keith Wayne

Baskin, Matthew P.

Baskin, Patricia L.

Clubhouse Sports Bar & Grill

Does 1-100

Fairoaks Village Associates

Valdez, Samuel Daniel

Fair Oaks Village Associates

Cross Defendant

Moes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael R Loewen

Defendant Attorneys

Richard M Watts, Jr

Caridad Pena-Colon

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Answer submitted by Valdez, Samuel Daniel rejected on 10/29/2015 .

Answer submitted by Valdez, Samuel Daniel rejected on 10/29/2015 . (Filed By: Valdez, Samuel(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Valdez, Samuel(Defendant))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action (ONLY as to the third cause of action-intentional tort for Keith Wayne Ballard.) filed.

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action (ONLY as to the third cause of action-intentional tort for Keith Wayne Ballard.) filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Baskin, Matthew(Defendant); Baskin, Patricia(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Ballard, Keith(Defendant))

Answer (Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Ballard, Keith(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Baskin, Matthew(Cross - Complainant); Baskin, Patricia(Cross - Complainant))

Correspondence (Confirming Letter Dropping Hearing Date of 11/10/2016 at 9:00 a.m. D54) filed.

Correspondence (Confirming Letter Dropping Hearing Date of 11/10/2016 at 9:00 a.m. D54) filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

Order on Ex Parte Application to Extend Time and to Select Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed.

Order on Ex Parte Application to Extend Time and to Select Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed. (Filed By: Loewen, Michael(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/15/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Ex Parte Application to Extend Time and to Select Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed. (Filed By: Loewen, Michael(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Select Trial Date and Mandatory Settlement Conference Date filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Confirming Letter Dropping Hearing Date of 11/10/2016 at 9:00 a.m. D54) filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Baskin, Matthew(Cross - Complainant); Baskin, Patricia(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 11/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • Valdez, Samuel Daniel Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/16/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Valdez, Samuel(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer submitted by Valdez, Samuel Daniel rejected on 10/29/2015 . (Filed By: Valdez, Samuel(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/18/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lazard, Rodney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less