This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 10/07/2018 at 11:01:35 (UTC).

Rockloans Marketplace, LLC vs. Michael Taylor

Case Summary

On 11/28/2017 Rockloans Marketplace, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Taylor. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2770

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rockloans Marketplace, LLC

Defendants

Does 1-15

Taylor, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanford Shatz

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/31/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/31/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed.

Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Default denied as to Taylor, Michael on Complaint .

Default denied as to Taylor, Michael on Complaint .

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/31/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default denied as to Taylor, Michael on Complaint .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/31/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/29/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rockloans Marketplace, LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shatz, Sanford