Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/06/2017 at 20:01:06 (UTC).

ROBERT J ADDOBATI. ET AL VS. U.S. HOME CORPORATION. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/12/2003 ROBERT J ADDOBATI filed an Other lawsuit against U S HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2653

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Duminy, Martial A.

Lawson King, Janice

Miller, Mark

Hubbard, Kay C.

Frediani, Phyllis

Generoso, Benita

Gutierrez, Vivian Y.

Flanagan, Klara

Defendants

Alenco Inc

Benta & Claudette Inc

Monarch Plumbing Inc

Westpac Industries Inc

Alenco a Div of Redmond Building Prod

Garnas & Rabe Construction Inc

Cross Defendants

Poulos, Ted

KTD Construction

General Aluminum

Green, Brian Charles

Personius, Paul E.

Trus Joist Macmillan Inc

199 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fred M Adelman

Cross Defendant Attorney

Mark R Mittelman

Other Attorneys

Larry B Moss

Daniel A Serot

James W Henderson, Jr

Grant C Woodruff

Patricia M Leary

James A Anton

Amanda R Lowe

Rhial N Devine

Julie McElroy

Jordan A Rodman

Jon A Van Woerkom

Andrew G Minney

Donald D Harmata

Robin J Smith

Richard N Sieving

William J Schmidt

Melissa Wood Eisenberg

Kathleen Quinlen Brown

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Addobati, Elizabeth(Plaintiff); Addobati, Robert(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Addobati, Elizabeth(Plaintiff); Addobati, Robert(Plaintiff))

Order Re: Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Order Re: Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Dismissal entered as requested, filed 12/3/07.

Dismissal entered as requested, filed 12/3/07.

Dismissal entered as requested, filed 12/12/07.

Dismissal entered as requested, filed 12/12/07.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: On the Mark Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Amended Order - Good Faith Settlement

Amended Order - Good Faith Settlement

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice Entry of Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice Entry of Order) filed. (Filed By: Horrigan, Willian(Cross - Defendant))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Addobati, Elizabeth(Plaintiff); Addobati, Robert(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Address filed.

Notice of Change of Address filed. (Filed By: Poulos, Ted(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Jeld Wen Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Jeld Wen Inc(Cross - Complainant); Summit Windows & Patio Doors(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (on Cross-Complaint 06-02-04) filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (on Cross-Complaint 06-02-04) filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: US Home Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2007
  • Batista, Paul added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Batista, Fernanda added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Balzer, David John added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Aletean, Viginia added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Aletean, Joseph added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Abrams Hall, Jessie added as a Plaintiff effective 05/12/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Addobati, Elizabeth(Plaintiff); Addobati, Robert(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Addobati, Elizabeth(Plaintiff); Addobati, Robert(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • Addobati, Elizabeth D added as a Plaintiff effective 12/03/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • Addobati, Robert J added as a Plaintiff effective 12/03/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Garnes & Rabe Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Alenco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Monarch Plumbing Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEARY, ESQ., PATRICIA M.