This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:14:52 (UTC).

Richard J Charles vs. George Pena

Case Summary

On 09/02/2009 Richard J Charles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against George Pena. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6723

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles, Richard J.

Defendants

TOMLISON, SCOTT

Pena, George

DOES 1-70

DILKS, GRAHM

DAVIN, Roger M.

Pena, Mabel

Davin Management Group Inc

SMITH, EVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle K Tambornini

Defendant Attorneys

Norma S Marshall

James William Rushford

Jennifer J. Capabianco

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/17/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/17/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 08/19/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 08/19/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 10/21/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 10/21/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/04/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/06/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/06/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/01/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/01/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/02/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/02/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/17/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/17/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/17/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/17/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Order to Show Cause-Compliance generated .

Order to Show Cause-Compliance generated .

Order to Show Cause - Compliance

Order to Show Cause - Compliance

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.

Attorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 08/19/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 08/19/2010 08:30:00 AM .

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2012
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/05/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: SMITH, EVETTE(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketDOES 1-70 added as a Defendant effective 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketSMITH, EVETTE added as a Defendant effective 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketDILKS, GRAHM added as a Defendant effective 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketTOMLISON, SCOTT added as a Defendant effective 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • DocketDAVIN, MIEK added as a Defendant effective 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Charles, Richard(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/02/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMBORNINI KYLE KARL