This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 18:34:16 (UTC).

REAGAN A OLIVARES VS JIM MARTIN. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 REAGAN A OLIVARES filed an Other lawsuit against JIM MARTIN. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5525

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olivares, Reagan

Defendants

Trovao, George J.

Freedom Capital Mortgage, Inc.

Fellini, Mario

William L. Lyons & Associates, Inc.

Huang, Jennifer

VFM Investment Group, LLC

Lyon, Michael P.

Golden Horizon Mortgage, Inc.

Viramontes, Gabriel

Gallo, Joseph S.

Warehime, Corinna J.

Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network

Huang, Yajen

Martin, Jim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hill Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Rizzardi

George Ziser

Trainor Fairbook

Segal & Kirby

James Martin

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Huang, Yajen(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Huang, Yajen(Defendant))

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/09/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/09/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyons & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Olivares, Reagan(Plaintiff))

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 5; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2007
  • Trainor Fairbook added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Miller Law, Inc. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Hunter, Richey, etc added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Hill Law Firm added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Segal & Kirby added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Seagal, Malcom S. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Hill, Dennis B. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Geary, James F. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Gallagher, Mark T. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Fairbrook, John D. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less