Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/30/2018 at 00:17:08 (UTC).

RAFAEL E AMAYA. ET AL VS. FORECAST HOMES. LP. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2003 RAFAEL E AMAYA filed an Other lawsuit against FORECAST HOMES LP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7107

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fazel, Rafia

Nayebkhill, Diba

White, Daljit- Gill

Johnson, Jamila

Huang, Yu Qi

Padilla, Evelia

Lankford, Durrwin

Smith, Willaim S.

Wu, Xiao Yu

Defendants

Forecast Group LP

Pacific Window Corporation

Park City Landscape

K Hovnanian Developments of California Inc

Signature Drywall Inc

Rylock Company LTD

Cross Defendants

Dynamic Roofing Company Inc

Kleary Masonry Inc

Alder Creek Millwork

B&B Construction

D&J Glass Service

253 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

David S Henningsen

Drew M Johnson

John W Herstead

Cross Defendant Attorney

Daniel A Serot

Other Attorneys

Brigitte M Mayo

Thomas R Beindorg

Thomas G Beatty

R Duane Skelton

Robert L Davis

Toni L Christiani

Jerry M Duncan

Kenneth D Harris

James Han

Paul R Cotter

Darryl M Yee

Mark D Mccauley

Jordan A Rodman

Miloslav Khadilkar

Joel Witzman

Andrew G Minney

35 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Returned Document Form [Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service rejected as endorsed copy of Dismissal not yet entered]

Returned Document Form [Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service rejected as endorsed copy of Dismissal not yet entered]

Declaration - Other (Marshall K Jaquish in support of motion for determination of good faith) filed.

Declaration - Other (Marshall K Jaquish in support of motion for determination of good faith) filed. (Filed By: SG Nelson Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/23/2008 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/23/2008 02:00:00 PM .

Statement - Other (Status Report Re: Execution fo Settlement Agreement and Release) filed.

Statement - Other (Status Report Re: Execution fo Settlement Agreement and Release) filed. (Filed By: Henningsen, David(Attorney))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Amaya, Maria(Plaintiff); Amaya, Rafael(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Avi Glikman In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment For Sanctions) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Avi Glikman In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment For Sanctions) filed. (Filed By: Rick H Hitch Plastering Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - PJ Law and Motion heard on 03/21/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - PJ Law and Motion heard on 03/21/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Ruling filed.

Notice of Ruling filed. (Filed By: Amaya, Maria(Plaintiff); Amaya, Rafael(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Forecast Homes LP(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Forecast Homes Inc(Defendant))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice - Other (Notice of Ruling) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Ruling) filed. (Filed By: Amaya, Rafael(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Atmos Corp(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Pacific Window Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Civil Special Sets; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
449 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2007
  • Camacicho, Jose added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Bonner, Angelina added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Batin, Faye added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Baclig, Sheila added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Baclig, Keith added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Avington, Marilyn added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Archuleta, Daniel added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Amin, Fatana added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Amaya, Maria Laura added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Amaya, Rafael E added as a Plaintiff effective 12/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K Hovnanian Developments of California is a litigant

Latest cases where Kleary Masonry, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Park City Landscape Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Rylock Company LTD is a litigant