This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/24/2017 at 13:43:55 (UTC).

Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation vs. R & A Painting Inc a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R A Painting Inc a California Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4171

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation

Defendants

R & A Painting Inc a California Corporation

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alexander V Hettena

Defendant Attorney

Craig Christensen

 

Court Documents

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: R & A Painting Inc a California Corporation(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: R & A Painting Inc a California Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/02/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company RRG a District of Columbia Corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V