This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 06:56:12 (UTC).

Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong vs. Pioneer House

Case Summary

On 10/29/2010 Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pioneer House. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0593

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hong, Shirley A.

Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong

Hong, Kenneth M.

Defendants

Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes

Hong, Raymond M.

Foundation Property Management Inc

Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes No Two

Does 1-50

Lehman, David H.

Pioneer House

Retirement Housing Foundation

RHF Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward P Dudensing

Defendant Attorney

Kim Wells

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP set on 06/24/2011 02:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP set on 06/24/2011 02:30:00 PM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (For Appointment Of Successor In Interest And Order Thereon) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (For Appointment Of Successor In Interest And Order Thereon) filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes No Two(Defendant); Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes(Defendant); Foundation Property Management Inc(Defendant); RHF Management Inc(Defendant); Retirement Housing Foundation(Defendant))

Notice - Other (amended notice of demurrer) filed.

Notice - Other (amended notice of demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes No Two(Defendant); Cathedral Pioneer Church Homes(Defendant); Foundation Property Management Inc(Defendant); RHF Management Inc(Defendant); Retirement Housing Foundation(Defendant))

Order - Other (Petition for Appointment of Successor in Interest and Order Thereon) filed.

Order - Other (Petition for Appointment of Successor in Interest and Order Thereon) filed.

Notice - Other (of hrg on demurrer) filed.

Notice - Other (of hrg on demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Lehman, David(Defendant))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Lehman, David(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Lehman, David(Defendant))

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 10:25 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:30 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Protective Order - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (For Appointment Of Successor In Interest And Order Thereon) filed. (Filed By: Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 45 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/29/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Hong, Kenneth(Plaintiff); Hong, Shirley(Plaintiff); Pik Chu Hong by and through her successor-in-interest Kenneth M Hong(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Foundations Property Management is a litigant

Latest cases where Retirement Housing Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward P. Dudensing