This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 17:11:20 (UTC).

Phillip Moses vs. Beazer Homes Holdings Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/22/2006 Phillip Moses filed an Other lawsuit against Beazer Homes Holdings Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5485

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hill, Connie

Tyler, Sharon

Edwards, Denise

Battimarco, Susan

Stercl, Raymond

Singh, Cynthia

Porras, Francisco Javier

Wynkoop, Peter

Porras, Rose

Wells, Leisa

Camerena, Maurice

Defendants and Cross Defendants

G & E Landscaping

Signature Drywall Inc

D&D Cabinets Inc

Pinnacle Construction

Beazer Homes Holdings Corp

Cross Defendants

Sacramento Building

G & E Landscaping

Teeters Electric Inc

Signature Drywall Inc

Pinnacle Construction

JC McKinney Masonry

Vaca Valley Roofing Inc

144 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Susan F Leonard

Patricia A Sisemore

Carlos C Cabral

Robert N Paige

John E Riddle

Other Attorneys

Benjamin W Blaisdell

Brigitte M Mayo

Mark Arruti

Daniel P Schrader

Conor H McElroy

Robert S Phillips, Jr

Megan M Chodzko

Victoria S Linder

Robert M Thompson

Stephen K Anderson

Paul T McBride

Jeffrey N Stewart

John V O'Meara

David M Levy

Robert A Bellagamba

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/19/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/11/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/11/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/11/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/11/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings Corp(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: JC McKinney Masonry(Cross - Defendant); Teeters Electric Inc(Cross - Defendant); Yard Furnishers Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings Corp(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products INC(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Wire To Wire Electric(Cross - Defendant))

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed.

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: Goodby Grading(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Roys Custom Cabinets Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hodge, Sharon(Plaintiff); Joseph J Goss Trustee(Plaintiff); Martin, Anna(Plaintiff); Martin, David(Plaintiff); Martin, Inez(Plaintiff); Martin, Loreen(Plaintiff); Moses, Katie(Plaintiff); Moses, Phillip(Plaintiff); Porras, Francisco(Plaintiff); Porras, Rose(Plaintiff); Takamoto, Matthew(Plaintiff); Tay, Timothy(Plaintiff); Wells, Andrew(Plaintiff); Wells, Leisa(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 08/17/2010 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 08/17/2010 02:00:00 PM .

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: Pinnacle Construction(Defendant))

Order - Other (Order Granted Appl for Determination of Good Faith Settlement of J.C. McKinney Masonry) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granted Appl for Determination of Good Faith Settlement of J.C. McKinney Masonry) filed.

354 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Ex Parte Appearance / Hearing; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
835 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2007
  • Battimarco, Susan added as a Plaintiff effective 12/22/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • Batten, Alinda P added as a Plaintiff effective 12/22/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products INC(Cross - Defendant); Atmos Homes Holdings Corp(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Alliance Building Products INC added as a Cross - Defendant effective 12/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Atmos Homes Holdings Corp added as a Cross - Complainant effective 12/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: J.R. Pierce Plumbing Company Inc. of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Disassociation of Attorney filed. (Filed By: J.R. Pierce Plumbing Company Inc. of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • J.R. Pierce Plumbing Company Inc. of Sacramento added as a Cross - Defendant effective 12/04/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Order No. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less