This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 18:34:24 (UTC).

PETER P CORREA VS JIM MARTIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 PETER P CORREA filed an Other lawsuit against JIM MARTIN. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5536

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Correa, Peter P.

Defendants

William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.,

Trovao, George J.

Freedom Capital Mortgage, Inc.

Fellini, Mario

Haung, Jennifer

Lyon, Michael P.

Haung, Yajen

Golden Horizon Mortgage, Inc.

Viramontes, Gabriel

VFM Investment Group, LLC

Gallo, Joseph

Warehime, Corinna J.

Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network

Martin, Jim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hill Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Trainor Fairbook

Segal & Kirby

James Martin

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals heard on 11/19/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (VFM Investment Group LLC)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (VFM Investment Group LLC)

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 11:38:08 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 11:38:08 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 11:38:08 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/03/2008 11:38:08 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Correa, Peter(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc., (Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Haung, Yajen(Defendant))

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Correa, Peter(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc., (Defendant))

Notice to File Dismissal And/Or Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal After Settlement

Notice to File Dismissal And/Or Order To Show Cause Regarding Dismissal After Settlement

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Correa, Peter(Plaintiff))

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 5; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2007
  • Fellini, Mario ||| added as a Defendant effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network added as a Defendant effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Trainor Fairbook added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Miller Law, Inc. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Hill Law Firm added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Segal & Kirby added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Seagal, Malcom S. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Hill, Dennis B. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Gallagher, Mark T. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2007
  • Fairbrook, John D. added as a Attorney effective 08/14/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less