Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/07/2017 at 17:40:52 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Atlantic Richfield Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2003 People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Atlantic Richfield Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5452

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carmichael Water District

San Juan Water Company

Citrus Heights Water District

Defendants

TRMI Holdings Inc

Chevron Corporation

Rauf, Abdul

El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company

Shell Oil Products Company

Bains Brothers, LLC

Juhasz, Klara

Unocal Corp

BP Products North America Inc

Equistar Chemicals LP

El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company

Ultramar Inc

Bains, Sartaj Singh

Gold Star Gas Food

Marrach, Edward

Jbeily, Elias

Interested Party

Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley K.

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor M Sher

Defendant Attorneys

Peter A Strotz

Scott J Borrowman

Suzanne Duddy

James L Brunello

Matthew T Heartney

Other Attorneys

Andrew T. Mortl

Colleen P Doyle

Albert Locher

Patricia L Bonheyo

Charles Correll

Whitney Jones Roy

Francis M Goldsberry

J Clifford Gunter, III

Alan J Hoffman

Michelle K Moritz

Timothy L Thompson

M Coy Connelly

Joseph T Ergastolo

Stephen J Meyer

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/27/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/27/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/26/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/26/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/07/2009 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/07/2009 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 05/13/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion set on 06/03/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice - Other (Notice Of Telephonic Appearance At The Case Management Conference Via Courtcall) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice Of Telephonic Appearance At The Case Management Conference Via Courtcall) filed. (Filed By: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Chevron Corporation(Defendant); Chevron USA Inc(Defendant); TRMI Holdings Inc(Defendant); Unocal Corp(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Fergs Market(Defendant); Juhasz, Julius(Defendant); Juhasz, Klara(Defendant))

Statement - Other (Verification of Answer of Defendants Tesoro Corporation and Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint) filed.

Statement - Other (Verification of Answer of Defendants Tesoro Corporation and Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company(Defendant))

Opposition to Noticed Motion (to motion to compel responses to third set of interrogatories) filed.

Opposition to Noticed Motion (to motion to compel responses to third set of interrogatories) filed. (Filed By: People of The State of California(Plaintiff))

Motion - Other (Notice of Motion and Motion to Renew Motion to Stay Action, or in The Altenative, Dismiss Based on Doctrine of Primary Jurisdiction) filed.

Motion - Other (Notice of Motion and Motion to Renew Motion to Stay Action, or in The Altenative, Dismiss Based on Doctrine of Primary Jurisdiction) filed. (Filed By: Atlantic Richfield Company(Defendant); BP Products North America Inc(Defendant); BP West Coast Products LLC(Defendant))

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed. (Filed By: Atlantic Richfield Company(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer Sedlachek) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Jennifer Sedlachek) filed. (Filed By: Exxon Mobil Corporation(Defendant))

Notice of Lodging (Copy of Non-California Authority) filed.

Notice of Lodging (Copy of Non-California Authority) filed. (Filed By: Exxon Mobil Corporation(Defendant); Exxonmobil Oil Corporation(Defendant))

722 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 36; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
1,048 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2008
  • Sacramento Groundwater Authority added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Sacramento County Water Agency added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Rio Linda Elverta Community Water added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Florin Resource Conservation District added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Fair Oaks Water District added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • City of Elk Grove added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Citrus Heights Water District added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • Carmichael Water District added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • California American Water Company added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2008
  • People of The State of California added as a Plaintiff effective 09/30/2003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equistar Chemicals, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXACO REFINING & MARKETING INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases where UNOCAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Ultramar Inc is a litigant