Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 16:50:27 (UTC).

Paul Olson vs. County of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 01/30/2014 Paul Olson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8176

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSON, PAUL

Defendants

COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO

DIGNITY HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION

DIGNITY HEALTH MEDICAL FOUNDATION

DOES 1-20

MERCY SAN JUAN HOSPITAL

SHERIFF 1

SHERIFF 2

Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Lusk

Defendant Attorney

Dennis P McPherson

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons submitted by Olson, Paul rejected on 02/18/2014 .

Summons submitted by Olson, Paul rejected on 02/18/2014 . (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 08/19/2014 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/19/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • McPherson, Dennis P added as a effective 05/08/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health dba Mercy San Juan Medical Center(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Olson, Paul rejected on 02/18/2014 . (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/23/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Olson, Paul(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mercy San Juan Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where Dignity Health Medical Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant