This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/17/2017 at 14:39:55 (UTC).

Patti Elaine Prock vs. Richard Dean Hansen

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 Patti Elaine Prock filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Richard Dean Hansen. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5566

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prock, Patti Elaine

Defendants

Does 1-30

Hansen, Richard Dean

Richard Dean Hansen individually and as Trustee of Richard Hansen Revocable Trust

Cross Plaintiff

Norcal Insurance Services, Inc

Cross Defendants

Hayhurst, Micah T.

Roes 1-30

Hayhurst Prock and Associates a California Corporation

Sabbe, Fred

Sabbe & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Seaton

Keith V Morris

Matthew K J Ninke

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew V Brady

Daniel P Costa

Cross Defendant Attorney

Nicholas D Yonano

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/11/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/11/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Sabbe, Fred(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Sabbe & Associates, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Richard Dean Hansen individually and as Trustee of Richard Hansen Revocable Trust(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike (Portion of Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Richard Dean Hansen individually and as Trustee of Richard Hansen Revocable Trust(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • Costa, Daniel P added as a effective 05/07/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Prock, Patti(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Prock, Patti(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Prock, Patti Elaine rejected on 02/24/2015 . (Filed By: Prock, Patti(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/11/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Prock, Patti(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Prock, Patti(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YONANO, NICHOLAS D