This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/02/2017 at 18:33:57 (UTC).

PATRICIA ROMANO VS JIM MARTIN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 PATRICIA ROMANO filed an Other lawsuit against JIM MARTIN. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5482

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnston, Jeffery

Romano, Patricia

Correa, Peter

Olivares, Reagan

Bakos, Walter

Defendants

Fellini III, Mario

William L Lyon & Associates Inc

Martin, Jim

Freedom Capital Mortgage

Huang, Jennifer

Lyon, Michael P.

Viramontes, Gabriel

VFM Investment

Gallo, Joseph

Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network

Huang, Yajen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis B Hill

Defendant Attorneys

John D Fairbrook

James Martin

Malcom S Segal

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/07/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/07/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

CMP Packet

CMP Packet

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network)

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Huang, Jennifer(Defendant); Huang, Yajen(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Romano, Patricia(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Huang, Yajen(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: William L Lyon & Associates Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Huang, Jennifer(Defendant); Huang, Yajen(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Romano, Patricia(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Bakos, Walter(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Correa, Peter(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Olivares, Reagan(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Romano, Patricia(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: William L Lyon & Associates Inc(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Romano, Patricia(Plaintiff))

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record - Appeals; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2007
  • Martin, Jim added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • William L Lyon & Associates Inc added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Lyon, Michael P added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Huang, Yajen added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Huang, Jennifer added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Gallo, Joseph added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Freedom Capital Mortgage added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Fellini, Mario III added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Esnian Mortgage & Realty Network added as a Defendant effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Romano, Patricia added as a Plaintiff effective 12/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less