This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/29/2017 at 21:48:14 (UTC).

Northern California Water Association vs. State Water Resources Control Board

Case Summary

On 03/04/2010 Northern California Water Association filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0461

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Central Valley Project Water Association

Mercy Springs Water District

A&G MONTNA Properties, LP

Kanawha Water District

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

Calaveras County Water District

Patterson Irrigation District

Proberta Water District

South Sutter Water district

Princeton-Codora-Glenn Irrigation District

Madera Irrigation District

Hollis, Reimers E.

Sacramento County Water Agency

Hallwood Irrigation Company

Trust Of Jesse Hawkins Cave III

Orland-Artois Water District

Turlock irrigation District/Modesto Irrigation District

Glide Water District

City Of Roseville

Browns Valley Irrigation District

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel Kelly

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: A&G MONTNA Properties, LP(Petitioner); Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District(Petitioner); Arvin-Edison Water Storage District(Petitioner); Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner); Bella Vista Water District(Petitioner); Brothers, Wallace(Petitioner); Browns Valley Irrigation District(Petitioner); Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner); Calaveras County Water District(Petitioner); Centerville Community Services District(Petitioner); Central San Joaquin Water Conservation District(Petitioner); Central Valley Project Water Association(Petitioner); Chowchilla Water District(Petitioner); City Of Roseville(Petitioner); Colusa County Water District(Petitioner); Contra Costa Water District(Petitioner); David, Rai(Petitioner); Del Puerto Water District(Petitioner); Delano-Earliment Irrigation District(Petitioner); Does 1-300(Petitioner))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice of Case Assignment

Notice of Case Assignment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed.

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed.

Proof of Service by Mail - Petition filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Central Valley Project Water Association(Petitioner); Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

Order - Other filed.

Order - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed.

Order Assigning Related Cases to a Single Judge

Order Assigning Related Cases to a Single Judge

Order - Other filed.

Order - Other filed.

Notice - Other (of final disposition of matter before the cal supreme court and request for status conference) filed.

Notice - Other (of final disposition of matter before the cal supreme court and request for status conference) filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Stone Corral Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Chowchilla Water District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Madera Irrigation District(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of final disposition of matter before the cal supreme court and request for status conference) filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketArvin-Edison Water Storage District added as a Petitioner effective 03/04/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketAnderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District added as a Petitioner effective 03/04/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketA&G MONTNA Properties, LP added as a Petitioner effective 03/04/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketCentral Valley Project Water Association added as a Petitioner effective 03/04/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 29 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Northern California Water Association(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: A&G MONTNA Properties, LP(Petitioner); Anderson-Cottonwood Irrigation District(Petitioner); Arvin-Edison Water Storage District(Petitioner); Banta-Carbona Irrigation District(Petitioner); Bella Vista Water District(Petitioner); Brothers, Wallace(Petitioner); Browns Valley Irrigation District(Petitioner); Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner); Calaveras County Water District(Petitioner); Centerville Community Services District(Petitioner); Central San Joaquin Water Conservation District(Petitioner); Central Valley Project Water Association(Petitioner); Chowchilla Water District(Petitioner); City Of Roseville(Petitioner); Colusa County Water District(Petitioner); Contra Costa Water District(Petitioner); David, Rai(Petitioner); Del Puerto Water District(Petitioner); Delano-Earliment Irrigation District(Petitioner); Does 1-300(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MADERA IRRIGATION DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Banta-Carbona Irrigation District is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Rockville is a litigant

Latest cases where Patterson Irrigation District GSA is a litigant