This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:20:27 (UTC).

Nathanael Grant vs. Andrew O Aster

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 Nathanael Grant filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Andrew O Aster. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1975

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grant, Nathanael

Defendants

Aster, Andrew O.

Does 1-75

PGH Wong Engineering Inc

Sacramento Regional Transit District

Sacramento RT

Roes 1-25

Cross Defendants

Roes 1-10

Safework Inc

Balfour Beatty Construction Company Inc

Teichert Construction

Guardian Ad Litem

Grant, Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayeo C Arnold

Defendant Attorneys

Richard M Jacobson

Ralph W Robinson

Jennifer K Stinnett

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Robert P Hamilton

John P Cotter

Glenn T Barger

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/30/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/30/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Not Doe) (Roe 2) filed.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Not Doe) (Roe 2) filed. (Filed By: PGH Wong Engineering Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (To PGH Wong Engineering Incs Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (To PGH Wong Engineering Incs Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Teichert Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Teichert Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.

Motion for Continuance of Trial filed. (Filed By: Teichert Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Supplemental, of Jeffrey Stewart in Support of) filed.

Declaration - Other (Supplemental, of Jeffrey Stewart in Support of) filed. (Filed By: Teichert Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 01/30/2018 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 01/30/2018 09:30:00 AM .

Notice of Ruling filed.

Notice of Ruling filed. (Filed By: Teichert Construction(Cross - Complainant); Teichert Construction(Cross - Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Balfour Beatty Construction Company Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. (Filed By: Safework Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Zachary Tolson in Support of ExParte App) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Zachary Tolson in Support of ExParte App) filed. (Filed By: Safework Inc(Defendant))

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Motion to Continue Trial filed.

Motion to Continue Trial filed. (Filed By: Safework Inc(Defendant))

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conf - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to File Cross-Complaint - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: PGH Wong Engineering Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Grant, Nathanael rejected on 08/25/2015 . (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Grant, Nathanael rejected on 07/22/2015 . (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Grant, Nathanael rejected on 07/22/2015 . (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketApplication for Guardian ad Litem and Summons forwarded to D 53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Grant, Nathanael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEICHERT CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeworks, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sacramento Regional Transit is a litigant

Latest cases where BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant