This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 12:30:10 (UTC).

Natalie Chance vs. Potamikin Automotive

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 Natalie Chance filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Potamikin Automotive. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8509

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chance, Natalie

Defendants

Potamikin Automotive

Sacramento Chrysler, Dodge, Jeep, and Ram

YPD Sacramento CJDR LLC

Motorcars LLC

Hyundai of Folsom LLC

PMC LLC

YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC

Motorcars West LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D Maloney

Defendant Attorney

Jon C McNutt

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/08/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/08/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/13/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/13/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Notice of Hearing of Settlement Conference generated .

Notice of Hearing of Settlement Conference generated .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for heard on 08/17/2020 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 08/17/2020 09:00:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Set Trial Date and Forego Additional Mandatory Settlement Conference) submitted by PMC LLC; YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC; Hyundai of Folsom LLC; Motorcars West LLC rejected on 09/30/2020 .

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Set Trial Date and Forego Additional Mandatory Settlement Conference) submitted by PMC LLC; YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC; Hyundai of Folsom LLC; Motorcars West LLC rejected on 09/30/2020 . (Filed By: Hyundai of Folsom LLC(Defendant); Motorcars West LLC(Defendant); PMC LLC(Defendant); YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC(Defendant))

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.

Motion to Continue Trial filed.

Motion to Continue Trial filed. (Filed By: Hyundai of Folsom LLC(Defendant); YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. (Filed By: Hyundai of Folsom LLC(Defendant); YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC(Defendant))

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Opposition (To Defendant's Motion To Continue Trial) filed.

Opposition (To Defendant's Motion To Continue Trial) filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 01/29/2021 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 01/29/2021 09:30:00 AM .

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions; Department: 37; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions; Department: 37; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions heard on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions heard on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment on Verdict filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketJudgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Jury verdict .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Jury verdict .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Post Trial Motions set on 06/18/2021 01:30:00 PM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/06/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/08/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chance, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YPD Sacramento CDJR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sacramento Chrysler Dodge Ram is a litigant

Latest cases where PMC (Nova Scotia) Company is a litigant

Latest cases where YPD Sacramento CJDR, LLC is a litigant