This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 02:06:18 (UTC).

Naeem Ahmad vs. Minh Nguyen

Case Summary

On 03/20/2012 Naeem Ahmad filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Minh Nguyen. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0772

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahmad, Naeem

Defendants

Does 1-50

Nguyen, Minh

Pho #1

Nguyen, Kellyanna

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Kellyanna(Defendant); Nguyen, Minh(Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney submitted by Ahmad, Naeem rejected on 06/08/2012 .

Substitution of Attorney submitted by Ahmad, Naeem rejected on 06/08/2012 . (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed.

Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2013 02:00:00 PM .

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/25/2013 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/25/2013 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Abdallah, Mitchell L added as a effective 06/14/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney submitted by Ahmad, Naeem rejected on 06/08/2012 . (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Kellyanna(Defendant); Nguyen, Minh(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • Ahmad, Naeem Application for Waiver granted in full on 03/21/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/20/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ahmad, Naeem(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less