Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 17:02:46 (UTC).

NAEATA KAUTAI. ET AL VS. KOCH TRUCKING. INC.. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2003 NAEATA KAUTAI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KOCH TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2567

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Paea, Veronica

Paea Jr, Viliami

Paea, Aleki

Kautai, Ileine Ada

Kautai, Meleane Fehoko

Singh, Harjinder

Richau, John

Paea, Semisi

Kautai, Naeata

Claimant

County of Sacramento

Defendants

Estate of Condi Charles Stell Jr

State of California Department of Transportation

Harris & Associates Inc

Charles, Condi

Stell, Chuck

Public Administrator for Los Angeles County

Estate of Condi Charles Stell

Koch Trucking Inc

Estate of Condi Stell

M Bumgarner Inc

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Harris

Edward C Valdez

Defendant Attorneys

David W Lively

John S Williamson

Lon Harris

Other Attorneys

Jeanne E Scherer

James A Dilling

Richard J Mitchell

Don L Stockett

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Stan Koch and Sons Trucking Inc(Defendant))

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed. (Filed By: Stockett, Don(Attorney))

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.3: Regarding C. Stell's Seatbelt Usage) filed.

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.3: Regarding C. Stell's Seatbelt Usage) filed. (Filed By: Paea, Aleki(Plaintiff); Paea, Semisi(Plaintiff); Paea, Sharron(Plaintiff); Paea, Veronica(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff))

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.4: To Exclude Opinions of Plntff Trucking Expert P. Herbert, Etc.) filed.

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.4: To Exclude Opinions of Plntff Trucking Expert P. Herbert, Etc.) filed. (Filed By: Paea, Aleki(Plaintiff); Paea, Semisi(Plaintiff); Paea, Sharron(Plaintiff); Paea, Veronica(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff))

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.6: To Exclude Evidence of Mr. Stell's Child Support Obligations) filed.

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.6: To Exclude Evidence of Mr. Stell's Child Support Obligations) filed. (Filed By: Paea, Aleki(Plaintiff); Paea, Semisi(Plaintiff); Paea, Sharron(Plaintiff); Paea, Veronica(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff))

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.8: To Exclude Introduction of Evidence of Speed Calculations, Speed Averages and/or Violations of Speed Laws by Condi C. Stell) filed.

Opposition (Plntff's Opposition to Mot. in Lim. No.8: To Exclude Introduction of Evidence of Speed Calculations, Speed Averages and/or Violations of Speed Laws by Condi C. Stell) filed. (Filed By: Paea, Aleki(Plaintiff); Paea, Semisi(Plaintiff); Paea, Sharron(Plaintiff); Paea, Veronica(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff); Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff))

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed.

Motion in Limine filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Opposition filed.

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/05/2008 04:52:42 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/05/2008 04:52:42 PM .

Correspondence (Letter-Confirming MSC) filed.

Correspondence (Letter-Confirming MSC) filed. (Filed By: Atmore, Michael(Plaintiff); Williamson, John(Attorney))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Paea, Viliami(Plaintiff))

Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed.

Petition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Fisilau(Plaintiff))

Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed.

Order for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute order Motion to Consolidate 6-11-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Ileine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Fisilau(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Fisilau(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Fisilau(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Acct. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Kautai, Meleane(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 34; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2003
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 34; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2003
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where Public Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell, Richard J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERER, JEANNE E.