Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/16/2017 at 18:31:34 (UTC).

Morgan Yarber vs. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Case Summary

On 11/06/2014 Morgan Yarber filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1298

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yarber, Morgan

Defendants

Does 1-20

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William F Wright

Defendant Attorney

Michele Ballard Miller

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/01/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/01/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to File Amended Complaint) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to File Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed.

Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Answer (Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant); Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/01/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/01/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/01/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/01/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 .

Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 . (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 .

Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 . (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 . (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Yarber, Morgan rejected on 04/15/2016 . (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/01/2015 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to File Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/01/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/07/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Yarber, Morgan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER MICHELE BALLARD