This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 16:47:17 (UTC).

Mohinder Singh Khosa vs. Robert A Bencome

Case Summary

On 12/11/2009 Mohinder Singh Khosa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Robert A Bencome. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6405

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Khosa, Mohinder Singh

Golden State Overnight

Muelrath, David

Kaur, Baljit

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Does 1-10

Bencomo, Robert Anastacio

R & R Carrazco Trucking

Carrazco, Roberto

Does 1-100

Carrazco, Roberto G.

Roes 1-20

Khosa, Mohinder Singh

Muelrath, David

Market Transport Limited

Walker, Gary Bruce

DOES 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Palvir K Shoker

Troy D Wiggins

Max G Arnold

Ann Marie DeFelice

Douglas A Sears

Defendant Attorney

Mark S Tratten

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/03/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/03/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/30/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/30/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Request for Entry of Default filed.

Request for Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Default denied as to Bencomo, Robert A on Complaint .

Default denied as to Bencomo, Robert A on Complaint . (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Cross - Complainant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Muelrath, David(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/03/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/03/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Golden State Overnight(Plaintiff))

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Market Transport Limited(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketCivil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 11/13/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketCross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Bencomo, Robert(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DocketTratten, Mark S added as a effective 07/14/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault denied as to Bencomo, Robert A on Complaint . (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/11/2009 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Kaur, Baljit(Plaintiff); Khosa, Mohinder(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARKET TRANSPORT LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE OVERNIGHT DEL. SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Marie DeFelice

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Douglas A.