This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/29/2017 at 18:11:22 (UTC).

Mihaela Ifrim vs. Kenneth Lee Trustee

Case Summary

On 02/18/2010 Mihaela Ifrim filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kenneth Lee Trustee. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0530

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ifrim, Mihaela

Defendants

Andrade, Jose A.

Kenneth Lee Trustee

Linda w Lee Trustee

Does 1 to 50

Babak, Saffarian

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-20

Arbitrators

Knezovich, James B.

Laskin, Alan M.

Long, Ernest A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Catia G Saraiva

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey G Nevin

Robin J Smith

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program set on 10/13/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program set on 10/13/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/09/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/09/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve (granted)

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve (granted)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Declaration of Due Diligence filed.

Declaration of Due Diligence filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Request for Entry of Default filed.

Request for Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Statement of Damages filed.

Statement of Damages filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

Default denied as to Andrade, Jose A on Amended Complaint .

Default denied as to Andrade, Jose A on Amended Complaint . (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Arbitrator Selection Process; Department: ARB; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Arbitrator Selection Process; Department: ARB; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 4:03 PM; Event Type: All Proceedings Stayed - CMP; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketAmended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketDoes 1 to 50 added as a Defendant effective 03/23/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketAndrade, Jose A added as a Defendant effective 03/23/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketBabak, Saffarian added as a Defendant effective 03/23/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 35 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/18/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Ifrim, Mihaela(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEVIN, JEFFREY G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin J Smith