This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 20:12:37 (UTC).

MICHAEL WEAVER. ET AL VS. EMARALD PARK COMPANY. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2006 MICHAEL WEAVER filed an Other lawsuit against EMARALD PARK COMPANY. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4000

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Weaver, Michelle

Weaver, Mason

Weaver Jr, Michael

Weaver, Michael

Defendants

Everest Concrete Construction

Dry Creek Lath & Plaster Inc

Guttridge, Michael

Emerald Park Company Inc

Ortiz, Jon

Cross Plaintiffs

Ortiz, Devonne

Latona Construction

Cross Defendant

Emerald Park Company

Guardian Ad Litem

Baroni, Tammy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C Miller, Jr

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J Campbell

Suzanne A Tollefson

David L Strong

Natalie P Vance

Bruce E Leonard

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/28/2007 02:28:31 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/28/2007 02:28:31 PM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed.

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: Dry Creek Lath & Plaster Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Dry Creek Lath & Plaster Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 02/25/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 02/25/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Weaver, Michael(Plaintiff))

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Denied submitted by Miller, John C Jr rejected on 07/15/2008 .

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Denied submitted by Miller, John C Jr rejected on 07/15/2008 . (Filed By: Miller, John(Attorney))

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Denied submitted by Miller, John C Jr rejected on 07/15/2008 .

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Denied submitted by Miller, John C Jr rejected on 07/15/2008 . (Filed By: Miller, John(Attorney))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Weaver, Michael(Plaintiff))

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 45 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 45 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Emerald Park Company Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Emerald Park Company Inc(Cross - Complainant); Guttridge, Michael(Cross - Complainant))

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/30/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • Case Notes generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Emerald Park Company Inc(Cross - Complainant); Guttridge, Michael(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2007
  • Strong, David L. added as a effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Miller, John C added as a effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Guttridge, Michael added as a Defendant effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Emerald Park Company added as a Cross - Defendant effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Emerald Park Company Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Baroni, Tammy added as a Guardian Ad Litem effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Weaver, Michael Jr added as a Plaintiff effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Weaver, Michael added as a Plaintiff effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Weaver, Mason added as a Plaintiff effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Weaver, Michelle added as a Plaintiff effective 09/20/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less