This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 12:31:49 (UTC).

MICHAEL TRYNOR ET AL VS CDM HOLDING. LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2006 MICHAEL TRYNOR filed an Other lawsuit against CDM HOLDING LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3561

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trynor, Dolly

Trynor, Michael

Defendants

CDM Holdings

Williams, Keller

Stewart Tile

Lyon, Michael

Jones, Michael

Thompson, Tim

Keller Williams Realty

William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.

Pest Detective Inc

Kukis Home Repair

Kukis, John

Sierra Valley Tile Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin P Hall

Defendant Attorneys

James O Moses

Howard J Stagg, IV

Debra L Samuels

David M Ingram

Robert W Lucas

 

Court Documents

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed.

Notice - Other (Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Dolly(Plaintiff); Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Determining That Settlement was Made In Good Faith) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Determining That Settlement was Made In Good Faith) filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Robert W Lucas In Support of Expert Witness Designation) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Robert W Lucas In Support of Expert Witness Designation) filed. (Filed By: Kukis, John(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Expert Witness Disclosure) filed.

Declaration - Other (Expert Witness Disclosure) filed. (Filed By: Kukis, John(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 04/22/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 04/22/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 04/23/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment heard on 04/23/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed.

Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

Dismissal not entered as requested

Dismissal not entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Pest Detective Inc(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Dolly(Plaintiff); Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Change of Address filed.

Notice of Change of Address filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Dolly(Plaintiff); Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Trynor, Dolly(Plaintiff); Trynor, Michael(Plaintiff))

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Day of Trial - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Day of Trial - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2007
  • Kukis, John added as a Defendant effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Pest Detective Inc added as a Defendant effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Thompson, Tim added as a Defendant effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Keller Williams Realty added as a Defendant effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Trynor, Michael added as a Plaintiff effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2007
  • Trynor, Dolly added as a Plaintiff effective 08/23/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • William L. Lyon & Associates, Inc. added as a Defendant effective 11/26/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less