This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/14/2017 at 17:05:26 (UTC).

Michael R Kelly vs. Murray & Young

Case Summary

On 12/14/2009 Michael R Kelly filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Murray Young. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6477

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nilva, William

Ramage, Scott

Goudeaux, Phillip

Pratt, Edward H.

Saxton, Richard

Abramson, Adam K.

Clifford, Joyce

Hineman, Richard

Goudeaux, Brenda

Ornelas, Leslie

Defendants

Murray CPA, William R.

Young, Anne

Murray, Wiliam Russell

Does 1-20

Young CPA, Anne

Murray and Young Inc an Accountancy Corporation a California Corporation

Murray, William R.

Murray & Young Inc

Does 1 - 50

Young, Anne Marie

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas D Reid

Peter N Scolney

Joseph W Scalia

Richard M Hoefflin

Defendant Attorneys

Richard S Linkert

Robert H Johnson

Michael W Carruth

Other Attorneys

Natalie P Vance

Loyal A Miner

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/18/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/18/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/09/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/09/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/11/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/11/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Complex set on 03/25/2013 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Complex set on 03/25/2013 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 02/28/2014 10:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 02/28/2014 10:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 09/09/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 09/09/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 11/19/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 11/19/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 12/16/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex set on 12/16/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Pratt, Edward(Plaintiff); Wells Pratt, Nancy(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 06/29/2012 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 06/29/2012 10:00:00 AM .

Notice - Other (Notice of Minute Order and Notice of Reassignment for Complex Case Management to Department 35) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Minute Order and Notice of Reassignment for Complex Case Management to Department 35) filed. (Filed By: Murray & Young, an Accountancy Corporation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Hineman, Richard(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Clifford, Joyce(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Ramage, Scott(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Pratt, Edward(Plaintiff))

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed. (Filed By: Goudeaux, Brenda(Plaintiff); Goudeaux, Phillip(Plaintiff))

288 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:00 PM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Status Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
393 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Murry & Young, an Accountancy Corporation - Doe 1(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • Linkert, Richard S added as a effective 04/01/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • Case assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/14/2009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kelly, Darlene(Plaintiff); Kelly, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANCE NATALIE PERRIN-