Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 20:49:39 (UTC).

Michael Canovas vs. California Department of Corrections

Case Summary

On 06/30/2014 Michael Canovas filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Corrections. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5693

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Canovas, Michael

Canovas, Tamara

Defendants

AW Tony Butler

C O Helsvig

C O J Alvarez

C O Scambler

California Department of Corrections

CCI Heinz

Chief J D Lozano (Office of Appeals)

D Artis (Office of Appeals)

Does 1-100

Jean Weiss Ombudsman

LT D Goodrich

LT Joe Tuggle

Sgt Sparkman

Warden Rick Hill (RET)

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons submitted by Canovas, Michael rejected on 07/01/2014 .

Summons submitted by Canovas, Michael rejected on 07/01/2014 . (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: AW Tony Butler(Defendant); C O Helsvig(Defendant); C O J Alvarez(Defendant); C O Scambler(Defendant); CCI Heinz(Defendant); Chief J D Lozano (Office of Appeals)(Defendant); D Artis (Office of Appeals)(Defendant); Jean Weiss Ombudsman(Defendant); LT Joe Tuggle(Defendant); Sgt Sparkman(Defendant); Warden Rick Hill (RET)(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2015
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: AW Tony Butler(Defendant); C O Helsvig(Defendant); C O J Alvarez(Defendant); C O Scambler(Defendant); CCI Heinz(Defendant); Chief J D Lozano (Office of Appeals)(Defendant); D Artis (Office of Appeals)(Defendant); Jean Weiss Ombudsman(Defendant); LT Joe Tuggle(Defendant); Sgt Sparkman(Defendant); Warden Rick Hill (RET)(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Canovas, Michael Application for Waiver granted in full on 07/03/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Canovas, Tamara Application for Waiver granted in full on 07/03/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Canovas, Michael rejected on 07/01/2014 . (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Canovas, Michael(Plaintiff); Canovas, Tamara(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant