This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/30/2019 at 23:18:33 (UTC).

McDonold vs. Lexington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/28/2014 McDonold filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7903

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCDONALD, ELAINE

SILVA TRUCKING INC

McDonold, Elaine

Defendants

BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BRISBOIS, LEWIS

CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN

CHOLARKIAN & ASSOCIATES

DOES 1-100

KUNG, JENNIFER

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

ZAPPALA, RALPH

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-100

Interested Parties

Elmer, James E.

Hackett, Debra Lynn

National Interstate Insurance Company

Hackett, William

Reiner, Eliot M.

Not Classified By Court

Bond, Cecily

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorneys

Frank M. Pitre

Brian J Panish

Jana I Lubert

Robert A Buccola

Christopher Lavorato

Eric J Emanuel

Steger P Johnson

James R Donahue

Defendant Attorneys

Quyen Thi Le

Mark E Inbody

Galina Kletser Jakobson

Edward F Donohue

Gregor A Hensrude

Steven H Gurnee

Stephen M Hayes

Jennifer L Keller

Timothy J Halloran

Celia Moutes-Lee

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/10/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 07/10/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/07/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/07/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/03/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/03/2014 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/05/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/05/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/05/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/05/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Complex Case Designation - Complex set on 03/10/2016 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Complex Case Designation - Complex set on 03/10/2016 01:30:00 PM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/23/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/23/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/02/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/02/2017 08:30:00 AM published .

Motion for Summary Judgment filed.

Motion for Summary Judgment filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In support of MSJ) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Linda Wendell Hsu) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Linda Wendell Hsu) filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Mark Inbody) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Mark Inbody) filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Bryan Fortay in support of MSJ) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Bryan Fortay in support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Paper Exhibits (In support of MSJ) filed.

Paper Exhibits (In support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Carolina Casualty Insurance Company(Cross - Complainant))

736 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Application for Order Sealing Record - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Application for Order Sealing Record - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
902 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: McDonold, Elaine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/03/2014 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed. (Filed By: Lexington Insurance Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Lexington Insurance Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: McDonold, Elaine(Plaintiff); Silva Trucking Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/25/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/06/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: McDonold, Elaine(Plaintiff); Silva Trucking Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: McDonold, Elaine(Plaintiff); Silva Trucking Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cholakian & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant