Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/24/2017 at 14:54:03 (UTC).

Matter of Cale Family Trusts

Case Summary

On 08/18/2004 Matter of Cale Family Trusts was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1217

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard W Ergo Trustee

Ergo, Richard W.

Petitioners and Trustees

Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn

Rodriquez, Lillian Joy

Mathison, Shirlyn

Ergo, Richard

Defendants and Interested Parties

Slater, Jeffrey B.

Slater, Sherry

Respondent and Interested Party

Gomez, Alfredo

Interested Parties

Ergo, Jack R.

Rodriquez, Lillian Joy

ERGO, ANITA

Gomez, Alfredo

Slater, Sherry

Ergo, Geoffrey B.

ERGO, DAVID C.

SLATER, JEFF

ERGO, ALLEN G.

Mathison, Shirlyn

Denasik, Domitry Matt

ERGO, JACK W.

LEONARDO, LINDA

LEONARDO, IV; BERNARDO

LEONARDO, MARGORIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas W Barth

Petitioner, Trustee and Interested Party Attorneys

KELLEY R. CARROLL

William Roscoe

James E Simon

THOMAS W. BARTH

Defendant Attorney

Linda D McCreary

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

Timothy M. Weir

Petitioner and Interested Party Attorneys

James E Simon

THOMAS W. BARTH

Timothy M. Weir

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/26/2009 10:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/26/2009 10:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 06/02/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/07/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/07/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 08/25/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 08/25/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 10/06/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 10/06/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 10/06/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Review - Probate set on 10/06/2010 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Probate Court Trial - Probate Trial set on 03/30/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Probate Court Trial - Probate Trial set on 03/30/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn; Ergo, Richard; Ergo, Geoffrey B on 11/10/2004 .

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn; Ergo, Richard; Ergo, Geoffrey B on 11/10/2004 . (Filed By: Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn(Trustee); Ergo, Geoffrey(Trustee); Ergo, Richard(Trustee))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn; Ergo, Geoffrey B; Ergo, Richard on 11/10/2004 .

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn; Ergo, Geoffrey B; Ergo, Richard on 11/10/2004 . (Filed By: Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn(Trustee); Ergo, Geoffrey(Trustee); Ergo, Richard(Trustee))

Attachment - Other (Supplemental Reply Declaration Of James E. Simon) filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn on 03/10/2006 .

Attachment - Other (Supplemental Reply Declaration Of James E. Simon) filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn on 03/10/2006 . (Filed By: Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn(Trustee))

Notice of Motion and Declaration filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn on 02/06/2006 .

Notice of Motion and Declaration filed by Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn on 02/06/2006 . (Filed By: Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn(Trustee))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/16/2007 02:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/16/2007 02:30:00 PM .

Affidavit/Declaration for Subpoena Duces Tecum filed.

Affidavit/Declaration for Subpoena Duces Tecum filed. (Filed By: Ergo, Geoffrey(Trustee); Ergo, Richard(Trustee))

SHIRLYN MATHISON'S RESPONSE BRIEF REGARDING THE NO CONTEST CLAUSE

SHIRLYN MATHISON'S RESPONSE BRIEF REGARDING THE NO CONTEST CLAUSE

Notice - Other (Notice of associaton of counsel) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of associaton of counsel) filed. (Filed By: Ergo, Geoffrey(Trustee); Ergo, Richard(Trustee))

Notice - Other (Notice of Pendency of Action) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Pendency of Action) filed. (Filed By: Ergo, Geoffrey(Trustee); Ergo, Richard(Trustee))

366 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Mathison, Shirlyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Probate scheduled for 04/08/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Probate Court Trial - Probate Trial scheduled for 03/30/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Rodriquez, Lillian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal Dated 3/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Probate scheduled for 04/08/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for heard on 03/14/2011 11:42:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order filed. (Filed By: Mathison, Shirlyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Probate Court Trial - Probate Trial set on 03/30/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
523 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/07/2007 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/07/2007 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Application - Other (Application for Determination that Proposed Petition is not a Contest Under Trust Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Ergo, Richard on 01/05/2007 . (Filed By: Ergo, Richard(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Gomez, Al on 01/31/2007 . (Filed By: Gomez, Alfredo(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • Gomez, Al added as a Respondent effective 02/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Ergo, Richard on 01/10/2007 . (Filed By: Ergo, Richard(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • Application - Other (Application for Determination that the Petitioners' Petition for Instructions does not Constitute a Contest Under the Trust Documents) filed by Ergo, Richard; Mathison, Shirlyn on 11/18/2004 . (Filed By: Bumgarner-Mathison, Shirlyn(Petitioner); Ergo, Richard(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • Roscoe, William added as a Attorney effective 02/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • Mathison, Shirlyn added as a Petitioner effective 02/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2007
  • Ergo, Richard added as a Petitioner effective 02/05/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barth, Thomas W.