Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 18:32:30 (UTC).

Marina Bolshakoff vs. California Department of Transportaion

Case Summary

On 06/10/2014 Marina Bolshakoff filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against California Department of Transportaion. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4722

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bolshakoff, Marina

Defendants

California Department of Transportaion

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia A Savage

Defendant Attorney

Ronald W Beals

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/23/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportaion(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • Beals, Ronald W added as a effective 09/11/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Summons issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bolshakoff, Marina(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEALS RONALD W.