This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/20/2017 at 01:11:58 (UTC).

Maria Pilar Camarena vs. Dignity Health

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 Maria Pilar Camarena filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7652

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rosas, Alyssa Pilar

Rosas, Roberto De Jesus

Camarena, Maria Pilar

Rosas, Lidia Danyn

Defendants

Gilcut P.A., Carl

Lewis M.D., Maria

Saggu M.D., Harkirat

Kasier Hospitals

Kaiser Permanente Medical Group

Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc

Does 1-100

Dignity Health

Sekhon M.D, Harjot

The Permanente Medical Group Inc.

Kasier Foundation Hospitals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle C Jenni

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas J Doyle

Mark A Muro

Barry Vogel

Michele Raley

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff); Rosas, Alyssa(Plaintiff); Rosas, Lidia(Plaintiff); Rosas, Roberto(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Of Petition to Compel Arbitration) filed.

Notice - Other (Of Petition to Compel Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Plaintiff); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

Paper Exhibits filed.

Paper Exhibits filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Plaintiff); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Lewis M.D., Maria(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Sekhon M.D, Harjot(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gilcut P.A., Carl(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

Reply (in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration & Stay Action) filed.

Reply (in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration & Stay Action) filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Plaintiff); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration & Stay Action) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration & Stay Action) filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Plaintiff); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/15/2016 11:38:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 03/15/2016 11:38:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Gilcut P.A., Carl(Defendant); Lewis M.D., Maria(Defendant))

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition to Compel Arbitration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Sekhon M.D, Harjot(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Gilcut P.A., Carl(Defendant); Lewis M.D., Maria(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff); Rosas, Alyssa(Plaintiff); Rosas, Lidia(Plaintiff); Rosas, Roberto(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disassociation of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Defendant); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Granting Kaiser Defendants' Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action) filed. (Filed By: Kasier Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kasier Foundation Hospitals(Defendant); The Permanente Medical Group Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff); Rosas, Alyssa(Plaintiff); Rosas, Lidia(Plaintiff); Rosas, Roberto(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/10/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff); Rosas, Alyssa(Plaintiff); Rosas, Lidia(Plaintiff); Rosas, Roberto(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Camarena, Maria(Plaintiff); Rosas, Alyssa(Plaintiff); Rosas, Lidia(Plaintiff); Rosas, Roberto(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less