This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:31:52 (UTC).

Marcus Gurion vs. Gramercy Healthcare LLC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 Marcus Gurion filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gramercy Healthcare LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4048

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gurion, Marcus

Gurion, Maxine

Gurion, Robert

Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)

Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)

Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)

Defendants

Cottage Park Place LP

Does 1-50

Gordon, Linda

Gramercy Healthcare LLC

Kawasaki, Yuquo

McCabe, David

West, Jeffrey

YK Enterprises LLC

Curion, George

Gurion, George

Fong, Sandra

Life Generations Healthcare LLC

Williams, Patricia

Williams III, Geroge Leroy

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wendy C York

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel K Mandelberg

David L. Ditora

Thomas E Beach

Jay C Patterson

George Nowotny

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 07/05/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 07/05/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/06/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/06/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Motion for Protective Order filed.

Motion for Protective Order filed. (Filed By: Cottage Park Place LP(Defendant); Gordon, Linda(Defendant); Gramercy Healthcare LLC a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

Statement - Other (separate statement in support of) filed.

Statement - Other (separate statement in support of) filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Defs Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed.

Opposition (to Defs Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/15/2017 01:17:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/15/2017 01:17:00 PM .

Answer (to 2nd amended complaint and demand for jury trial) filed.

Answer (to 2nd amended complaint and demand for jury trial) filed. (Filed By: Cottage Park Place LP(Defendant); Gordon, Linda(Defendant); Gramercy Healthcare LLC a Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Order filed.

Notice of Entry of Order filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff))

Response (to meet and Confer Declaration of Jay C Patterson Re Motion to Strike) filed.

Response (to meet and Confer Declaration of Jay C Patterson Re Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (for Order STri) filed.

Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (for Order STri) filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Ghc of Sac-Snf LLC(Defendant); Life Generations Healthcare LLC(Defendant); Olds, Thomas(Defendant))

Judgment (Re: Judgment of Dismissal) filed.

Judgment (Re: Judgment of Dismissal) filed.

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Gordon, Linda(Defendant))

Motion to Compel - Other (Deposition of defs Cottage Park Place Re: Policies and Procedures and Production of Documents) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (Deposition of defs Cottage Park Place Re: Policies and Procedures and Production of Documents) filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

Reply filed.

Reply filed. (Filed By: Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order) filed. (Filed By: Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order (Def Gramercy Healthcare Request for Production) filed.

Proposed Order (Def Gramercy Healthcare Request for Production) filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff); Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

416 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:09 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
630 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/07/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/10/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff); Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff); Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Gurion, Marcus(Plaintiff); Gurion, Maxine(Plaintiff); Gurion, Robert(Plaintiff); Marcus Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Maxine Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff); Robert Gurion as successor in interest to Evelyn Gurion (Decedent)(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less