This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:56:38 (UTC).

LOUIS ADAMS ET AL VS CENTEX HOMES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/27/2006 LOUIS ADAMS filed an Other lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1777

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kyle, Linda

Gomez, Alma

Hasan, Saed

Critcher, Haide

Padilla, Francisco

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Tri-K Truss

Sondad Industries Inc

Cross Defendants

Erickson Carpentry Contractors

Western Insulation Inc

SGN Construction Inc

Production Framing Systems Consulting Inc

Production Framing Systems Inc

Timberlake Cabinet Co

Valley Flame Inc

Barlows Wood Shop

JBS Construction Inc

Sondad Industries Inc

American Woodmark Corp

Certified Window Installations Inc

Rayco Electric Inc

Special Master

Margolis, John

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fred M Adelman

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Jitesh G Panchal

Bob Sims

John L. Boze

Benjamin W Blaisdell

David M Levy

Other Attorneys

Raymond Meyer, Jr

Brigitte M Mayo

Elizabeth A Skane

Anne E Connelly

Paul B Walsh

Joel Witzman

Thomas W Purtell

Robyn S McClain

Jamie A Pearson

Paul R Cotter

Jan A Gruen

Julie McElroy

Jacob Flesher

Laura Buttrell

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/03/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/30/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/29/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/29/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/27/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/27/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/28/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/30/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/30/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Production Framing Systems Consulting Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Blazona Concrete Construction Inc - Doe 214(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Adams, Louis(Plaintiff); Adams, Paula(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Kenyon Plastering Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice - Other (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel) filed. (Filed By: Marmitec Corporation(Cross - Defendant); Simas Floor Co Inc(Cross - Defendant); Sondad Industries Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Order Granting Motion for Good Faith Settlement of Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc.

Order Granting Motion for Good Faith Settlement of Energetic Painting and Drywall, Inc.

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Centex Homes(Cross - Complainant); Centex Real Estate Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Order No. 10

Case Management Order No. 10

Ret Doc; Dismissal is not clear as to filing party and what action party is being dismissed from

Ret Doc; Dismissal is not clear as to filing party and what action party is being dismissed from

317 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
524 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2007
  • Conner, Michael added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Casarino, Erlinda added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Cardenas, Arthur added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Bush, Michael added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Bennett, Rob added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Adams, Paula added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Adams, Louis added as a Plaintiff effective 04/27/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Order No. 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less