Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/07/2017 at 06:02:47 (UTC).

Los Angeles Times Communications LLC v. CA Comm on Peace Officer Standards & Training

Case Summary

On 07/23/2003 Los Angeles Times Communications LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CA Comm on Peace Officer Standards Training. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1077

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Respondents

City of Hayward

California Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training

Intervenors

Visalia Police Department

City Of Santa Ana

City of San Ramon

City of Anaheim

City of Sacramento

City of Yreka

City of Torrance

City of Dixon

City of Petaluma

County of Orange

City of Citrus Heights

City of Fairfield

Los Angeles Police Protective League (LAPPL)

City of Livermore

Maywood Police Department

City of Visalia

City of Atwater

Legal Defense Fund of the Peace Officers Research Association of California Inc

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Intervenor Attorneys

Randolph S. Hom

Alison Berry Wilkinson

Michael E Whitaker

Leonard C Herr

Paula J Coleman

Moses W Johnson, IV

Eileen M Teichert

Mary Frances McHugh

David L. Caceres

Tricia L Hynes

Marianne Van Riper

Ginetta L. Giovinco

E Kevin Young

Sandra J Garcia

Other Attorneys

Rochelle L Wilcox

Karlene Goller

 

Court Documents

Third Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs (granted)

Third Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs (granted)

Motion for Leave to Intervene filed.

Motion for Leave to Intervene filed. (Filed By: City of Hayward(Respondent))

Motion - Other (for Redaction of Officers' Names) filed.

Motion - Other (for Redaction of Officers' Names) filed. (Filed By: City of Fairfield(Intervenor))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Intervenor))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: City of Livermore(Intervenor))

Motion for Leave to Intervene filed.

Motion for Leave to Intervene filed. (Filed By: City of Petaluma(Intervenor))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Commander Bryan Roberts in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Commander Bryan Roberts in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: City of Citrus Heights(Intervenor))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Captain Joe Gorton in Support of City of San Ramon's Motion to Intervene) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Captain Joe Gorton in Support of City of San Ramon's Motion to Intervene) filed. (Filed By: City of San Ramon(Intervenor))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Leonard C Herr) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Leonard C Herr) filed. (Filed By: City of Visalia(Intervenor); Visalia Police Department(Intervenor))

Fourth Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs (granted)

Fourth Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs (granted)

Notice of Change of Address filed.

Notice of Change of Address filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Intervenor))

Fifth Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorney Fees, Memoranda of Costs

Fifth Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorney Fees, Memoranda of Costs

Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order On: Stipulation And Order Continuing Hearing Date On Motions Applications To Intervene) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order On: Stipulation And Order Continuing Hearing Date On Motions Applications To Intervene) filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (Continuing Hearing Date on Motions/Applications to Intervene) filed.

Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (Continuing Hearing Date on Motions/Applications to Intervene) filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

Notice of Appearance filed.

Notice of Appearance filed. (Filed By: City Of Santa Ana(Intervenor))

Stipulation Only - Other filed.

Stipulation Only - Other filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Notice Of Request That Motion For Leave To Intervene Be Taken Off Calendar) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice Of Request That Motion For Leave To Intervene Be Taken Off Calendar) filed. (Filed By: Legal Defense Fund of the Peace Officers Research Association of California Inc(Intervenor))

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate; Department: 33; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate; Department: 33; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order Denying Petitioner's Motion to Compel Enforcement of Respondent's 2008 Statement of Compliance or, in the Alternative, to Compel Disclosure of Unredacted Peace Officer Identifying Information) filed. (Filed By: California Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (Proposed Order Denying Petitioner's Motion to Compel Enforcement of Respondent's 2008 Statement of Compliance or, in the Alternative, to Compel Disclosure of Unredacted Peace Officer Identifying Information) filed. (Filed By: California Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Objections...) filed. (Filed By: California Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 06/01/2012 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Response filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
273 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2007
  • Remittitur to Trial Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Remittitur to Trial Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • Corrected Remittitur to Trial Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Corrected Remittitur to Trial Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • Corrected Remittitur to Trial Court Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Second Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Memoranda of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed. (Filed By: Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2007
  • Los Angeles Times Communications LLC added as a Plaintiff effective 12/19/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Dixon is a litigant

Latest cases where Maywood Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Hayward is a litigant

Latest cases where Visalia Police Department is a litigant