This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 04:54:01 (UTC).

Lorraine Heard vs. Pulte Home Corporation a Michigan Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 Lorraine Heard filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation a Michigan Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0738

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heard, Lorraine

Defendants

Pulte Home Corporation a Michigan Corporation

Del Webb California Corporation

Does 1 - 1000

Pulte Home Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Jackson

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment to Department 35 For Complex Case Management Determination

Notice of Assignment to Department 35 For Complex Case Management Determination

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

34-2017-00220738-CU-CD-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2017-00210328-CU-CD-GDS on 12/27/2017 .

34-2017-00220738-CU-CD-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2017-00210328-CU-CD-GDS on 12/27/2017 .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 34-2017-00220738-CU-CD-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2017-00210328-CU-CD-GDS on 12/27/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/11/2018 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/11/2018 at 11:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Assignment to Department 35 For Complex Case Management Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Notice of Assignment to Department 35 For Complex Case Management Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/18/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Heard, Lorraine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEL WEBB CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackson, Lee