This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/24/2017 at 01:44:02 (UTC).

Lorenzo Baca vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 10/01/2013 Lorenzo Baca filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2484

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACA, LORENZO

Defendants

DOES 1-100

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Heather Glick

Julie L Harlan

 

Court Documents

Baca v. State Personnel Board - Tentative Ruling on CDCR's Motion to Strike

Baca v. State Personnel Board - Tentative Ruling on CDCR's Motion to Strike

Baca v. State Personnel Board - Tentative Ruling on CDCR's Demurrer

Baca v. State Personnel Board - Tentative Ruling on CDCR's Demurrer

Lorenzo Baca v. California State Personnel Board - Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Damages

Lorenzo Baca v. California State Personnel Board - Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Damages

Baca v. California State Personnel Board/CDCR

Baca v. California State Personnel Board/CDCR

Baca v. State of California - Motion to Withdraw

Baca v. State of California - Motion to Withdraw

Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 .

Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 . (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 .

Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 . (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Summons (on Second Amended Complaint) filed.

Summons (on Second Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Motion to Strike (Allegations in 2nd Amended Complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Allegations in 2nd Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of George H Jones in support of plaintiffs Opp to def Motion to strike allegations in plaintiff's 2nd amended complaint) filed.

Declaration - Other (of George H Jones in support of plaintiffs Opp to def Motion to strike allegations in plaintiff's 2nd amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Writ of Mandate heard on 08/15/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Writ of Mandate heard on 08/15/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Notice of Hearing (on the Merits) filed.

Notice of Hearing (on the Merits) filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of George H Jones) filed.

Declaration - Other (of George H Jones) filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Hearing - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Writ of Mandate; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Unavailability of Counsel) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Writ of Mandate heard on 12/16/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 . (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Baca, Lorenzo rejected on 01/14/2014 . (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation added as a Defendant effective 12/23/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (Petition for Writ of Mandate and Second Amended Complaint for Damages) filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/22/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/29/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Baca, Lorenzo(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less