Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/08/2017 at 19:47:02 (UTC).

LISA MIRANDA. ET LA VS. TIM LEWIS CONSTRUCTION. INC.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2004 LISA MIRANDA ET LA filed an Other lawsuit against TIM LEWIS CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0330

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martin, David

The Mizue Nickerson Revocable Trust

Thibault, Janis

Epps, Una Van

Martin, John

Martin, Anita

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Tim Lewis Construction, Inc.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Inland Materials, Inc.

Tim Lewis Construction, Inc.

Sacramento Masonry Craftman

Dynamic Roofing Company, Inc.

Wilmor and Sons Pluming and Construction

Kenyon Construction, Inc.

Guaranteed Products Corp.

SGN Construction, Inc.

Caltex Industries, Inc.

Norman's Construction and Electric

Loomis Cabinet Company

Deal Sheet Metal, Inc.

Norman's Electric

Frontier Fence Company

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Eugene P Haydu Jr

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Carla Braunstein

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Anwyl Scoffield Stepp

Leigh A Stepp

Carla Braunstein

Murchison & Cumming LLP

Elie and Associates

Vitale & Lowe

McNamara, Dodge, Ney

Wayne Thomas & Associates

Ericksen, Arbuthnot, etc.

Law Office of Kevin Pegan

Arruti & Associates

Other Attorneys

Law Office of Samuel G Grader

Schaffer, Lax, etc.

Archer Norris

Field, Warwick & Sanders

 

Court Documents

Joinder in Motion filed.

Joinder in Motion filed. (Filed By: General Aluminum Corporation(Cross - Defendant); Guaranteed Products Corp.(Cross - Defendant))

Index of Pre-trial Motions filed

Index of Pre-trial Motions filed

Motion - Other (Pre-Trial Motion No. 5) filed.

Motion - Other (Pre-Trial Motion No. 5) filed. (Filed By: Tim Lewis Construction, Inc.(Defendant))

Joinder in Motion (In Motions in Limine) filed.

Joinder in Motion (In Motions in Limine) filed. (Filed By: Kenyon Construction, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Joinder in Motion filed.

Joinder in Motion filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

Joinder in Motion filed.

Joinder in Motion filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

Joinder in Motion filed.

Joinder in Motion filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

Objection (of Eugene P Haydu in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Tim Lewis' Pretrial Motion) filed.

Objection (of Eugene P Haydu in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Tim Lewis' Pretrial Motion) filed. (Filed By: Miranda, Lisa(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of their Opposition to Motion in Limine) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of their Opposition to Motion in Limine) filed. (Filed By: Miranda, Lisa(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition to Tim Lewis' Pre Trial Motion No 8) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition to Tim Lewis' Pre Trial Motion No 8) filed. (Filed By: Miranda, Lisa(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Eugnene P Haydu in Support of Oppositon to Tim Lewis' Pretrial Motions No. 5,6,7 & 8) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Eugnene P Haydu in Support of Oppositon to Tim Lewis' Pretrial Motions No. 5,6,7 & 8) filed. (Filed By: Miranda, Lisa(Plaintiff))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Kenyon Construction, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (Proposed Order And Stipulation For The Continuance Of The Evidence Code Section 402 Hearing Regarding James Moore On Stucco Qualifications) filed.

Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (Proposed Order And Stipulation For The Continuance Of The Evidence Code Section 402 Hearing Regarding James Moore On Stucco Qualifications) filed. (Filed By: Kenyon Construction, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Of Ronald G Whitehead Corporations Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Ronald G Whitehead Corporations Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement) filed. (Filed By: Guaranteed Products Corp.(Cross - Defendant))

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed.

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Joinder in Opposition filed.

Joinder in Opposition filed. (Filed By: S. G. Nelson Construction, Co.(Cross - Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Inland Materials, Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets; Department: 58; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 58; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets; Department: 58; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets; Department: 58; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2007
  • Richardson, Joe added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Nickerson, Mizue added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Nguyen, Hue added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Miranda, Lisa added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Martinez, Laura added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Martin, John added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Martin, David added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Martin, Anita added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Gaines, Guy added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • Gaines, Eva added as a Plaintiff effective 07/11/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where TIM LEWIS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Inland Materials, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Deal Sheet Metal Inc is a litigant